+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 10/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 28
- 12:55 PM 9/21/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 33(AET)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/2018
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN, HUGHES, MICCICHE, COSTELLO, SHOWER
- MACKINNON, STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, MEYER
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHJR 33(AET)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, OLSON
- ARC RPT 3DP
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, GARDNER, STEVENS, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, KELLY
- ARC
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 33(AET)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AET CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y39 N1
- CLAMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, SPOHNHOLZ, GRENN, DRUMMOND
- VERSION: CSHJR 33(AET)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, LINCOLN
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOPP
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- AM: NEUMAN, TALERICO
- DP: EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, TUCK, LINCOLN
- AET RPT CS(AET) NT 4DP 2AM
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- AET
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor