+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- HELD ON SECRETARY'S DESK
- RULES TO 3RD SUP CALENDAR 4/15/12
On April 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- NR: FRENCH
- DP: WAGONER, PASKVAN, WIELECHOWSKI
- RES RPT 3DP 1NR
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MENARD, MEYER, HUGGINS, WAGONER, THOMAS
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 32(RES)
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 32(RES)
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/26 CALENDAR
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/2012
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- DP: MUNOZ, FOSTER, GARDNER, DICK, HERRON, P.WILSON, SEATON, FEIGE
- RES RPT CS(RES) 8DP 1AM
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS