+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, GIESSEL
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 32(STA)
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, STOLTZE, HUGHES, JOHNSON, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 32(STA)
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 5DP
- DP: GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLER
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA