+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On April 5, 2004 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 38
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- 2:43 PM 3/17/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 E5 A1
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 32(FSH) AM
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y16 N- E4
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: CSHJR 32(FSH) AM S
On March 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/2004
- HELD TO 3/15 CALENDAR
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 7DP
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, LINCOLN, DYSON,
- ELTON, WAGONER, STEVENS B
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/16/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FSH CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM 1 TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM 2 TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 AS AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 32(FSH) AM
- PASSED Y36 E4
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD, OGG, WEYHRAUCH
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 32(FSH) AM
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(FSH) NT 4DP
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, DAHLSTROM, ANDERSON
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTO, JOULE
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 6DP
- DP: GARA, OGG, SAMUELS, WILSON,
- GUTTENBERG, SEATON
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, SAMUELS
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MOSES, COGHILL, WILSON
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WOLF
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, MEYER, CROFT,
- GRUENBERG, KOOKESH
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, GUTTENBERG,
- LYNN, CISSNA, CHENAULT, SEATON,
- KAPSNER, KOTT, HEINZE
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH, L&C
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor