+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On July 10, 1997 in the House:
- 10:40 AM 6/4/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/11 LEGIS RESOLVE 40
On May 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- PLACED AT BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 31
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
On May 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR & 1NR 5/10/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCE TO THIRD RDG FAILED Y14 N5 E1
- THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR
On May 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: LEMAN, MACKIE, MILLER; NR: HOFFMAN
- (H) ZERO FN (H.L&C/DHSS)
On April 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- LABOR & COMMERCE
On April 18, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 31
- PASSED Y35 E4 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 17, 1997 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/18 CALENDAR
On April 4, 1997 in the House:
- L&C RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: ROKEBERG, COWDERY, SANDERS, RYAN
- NR: BRICE, HUDSON
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.L&C/DHSS)
On March 18, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- LABOR & COMMERCE
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor