+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On October 31, 2014 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 9/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 38
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 2:52 PM 7/1/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HJR 30 AM
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 30 AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 5DP
- DP: GIESSEL, FRENCH, MICCICHE, BISHOP, DYSON
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- RES WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- MEYER, MICCICHE, OLSON, STEVENS, KELLY
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, COGHILL, MCGUIRE, BISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL, FAIRCLOUGH,
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y28 N7 E4 A1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 30
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 Y31 N3 E4 A2
- VERSION: HJR 30 AM
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y22 N12 E4 A2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y34 E4 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, JOHNSON, EDGMON, ISAACSON, FEIGE, T.WILSON, HOLMES,
- PRUITT, OLSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: JOHNSON, KAWASAKI, HAWKER, P.WILSON, OLSON, SEATON, TARR, SADDLER, FEIGE
- RES RPT 9DP
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor