+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 13, 1999 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/12 LEGIS RESOLVE 6
On April 9, 1999 in the House:
- 9:35 AM 4/9/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 28(RES)
- PASSED Y16 N- E4
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On March 31, 1999 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4DP 1 OR 3/31/99
- DP: TIM KELLY, MILLER, LEMAN, PEARCE;
- OTHER RECOMMENDATION: ELLIS
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.RES)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/1 CAL
On March 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RLS
On March 25, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 28(RES)
- PASSED Y34 E5 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN, DYSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 3DP 2NR
- DP: OGAN, SANDERS, BARNES; NR: JOULE,
- MORGAN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.RES)
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RES