+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- REFERRED TO ARCTIC POLICY, ECONOMIC DEV., & TOURISM
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: RAUSCHER, SPOHNHOLZ, TUCK, JACKSON, SHAW, THOMPSON
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) 6DP
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- MLV, AET
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS