+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- NR: PASKVAN, FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI
- DP: WAGONER
- RES RPT 1DP 3NR
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- DIVIDE AM NO 1A WITHDRAWN
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- DIVIDE THE AMENDMENT UC
- AM NO 1A
- AM NO 1A ADOPTED Y20 N18 E2
- AM NO 1B FAILED Y8 N30 E2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 26(RES) AM
- PASSED Y38 E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 26(RES) AM
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: GARDNER
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- NR: GARDNER, HERRON
- DP: MUNOZ, FOSTER, P.WILSON, DICK, SEATON, FEIGE
- RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 2NR 1AM
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DICK
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS