+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/4 LEGIS RESOLVE 30
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HJR 26
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, ELLIS, GARDNER
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 26
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- 6:18 PM 3/3/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- NR: FRENCH
- DP: GIESSEL, MCGUIRE, MICCICHE, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH
- RES RPT 5DP 1NR
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2014
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/3 CALENDAR
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- KELLY, EGAN, STEDMAN, FRENCH, DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE, STEVENS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, MCGUIRE, COGHILL, BISHOP, DYSON,
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 26
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RES RPT 5DP
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/21/2014
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: SEATON, JOHNSON, OLSON, FEIGE, SADDLER
- FEIGE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y30 E9 V1
- P.WILSON, LYNN, STOLTZE, THOMPSON, CHENAULT
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- RESCIND ACTION IN ADVANCING TO 3D UC
- IN SECOND READING
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 26
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y30 E9 V1
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON, ISAACSON, SEATON, KREISS-TOMKINS, PRUITT,
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HJR 26
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor