+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On September 27, 1995 in the House:
- NOTED BY GOVERNOR 9/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 32
On June 27, 1995 in the House:
- 10:10 AM 6/13/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHJR 25(RES)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 12, 1995 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/95
- HELD TO 5/13/95
On April 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 4DP 2NR
- HOUSE ZERO FN (F&G)
On March 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TAYLOR
On March 20, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHJR 25(RES)
- PASSED Y39 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): NAVARRE, MACKIE, TOOHEY
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 17, 1995 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 1NR
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- DP: DAVIES, MACLEAN, GREEN, KOTT, OGAN
- DP: WILLIAMS
- NR: AUSTERMAN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (F&G) 3/3/95
On March 15, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILLIAMS
On March 3, 1995 in the House:
- FSH RPT 2DP 3NR
- DP: ELTON, MOSES
- NR: OGAN, AUSTERMAN, G.DAVIS
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (F&G)
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
- FSH, RESOURCES
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FSH, RES