+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 3/11 LEGIS RESOLVE 39
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- 9:40 AM 3/07/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/96
- ZERO FN (F&G)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TAYLOR, TORGERSON,
- LEMAN,, LINCOLN, HOFFMAN, SALO,
- ZHAROFF, DUNCAN, HALFORD
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 24(FSH)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 7DP
- (H) ZERO FN (F&G)
On April 29, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FSH CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 24(FSH)
On April 29, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 29, 1995 in the House:
- PASSED Y31 E4 A5
- COSPONSOR(S): NAVARRE, ROKEBERG,
- WILLIAMS
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 29, 1995 in the Senate:
- RESOURCES
On April 28, 1995 in the House:
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) 4DP
- DP: AUSTERMAN, MOSES, ELTON, OGAN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (F&G)
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FINKELSTEIN
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FSH
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor