+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 24, 2011 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 26
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- 12:44 PM 5/11/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HJR 24
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 24
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2011
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.CRA)
- NR: OLSON
- DP: WAGONER, ELLIS
- CRA RPT 2DP 1NR
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- VERSION: HJR 24
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, JOHNSON
- PASSED Y39 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 24
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2011
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN
- FN1: ZERO(H.CRA)
- DP: FOSTER, SADDLER, GARDNER, MUNOZ
- CRA RPT 4DP
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS