+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 34
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- 2:20 PM 4/16/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, BISHOP, GARDNER, MCGUIRE, EGAN, GIESSEL, FAIRCLOUGH,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2014
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 24(STA)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STEDMAN, MEYER, FRENCH, STEVENS, OLSON, ELLIS, WIELECHOWSKI, MICCICHE, DUNLEAVY,
- COGHILL, KELLY, DYSON
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHJR 24(STA)
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 5DP
- DP: GATTIS, KELLER, KREISS-TOMKINS, HUGHES, LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 24(STA)
- ALL MEMBERS PRESENT AS COSPONSORS UC
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, AUSTERMAN, COSTELLO, FEIGE, GARA, GATTIS, GRUENBERG,
- GUTTENBERG, HAWKER, HOLMES, HUGHES, ISAACSON, JOHNSON, JOSEPHSON, KELLER,
- KITO III, KREISS-TOMKINS, LEDOUX, LYNN, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, OLSON, PRUITT, SEATON,
- STOLTZE, TUCK, P.WILSON, T.WILSON
- PASSED Y31 E9
- VERSION: CSHJR 24(STA)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor