+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 28, 2007 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 9/5 LEGIS RESOLVE 17
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- 5:09 PM 6/1/07 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HJR 23
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y16 N3 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 23
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2007
On May 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.STA)
- DP: DAVIS, ELTON, THOMAS
- HES RPT 3DP
On May 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- VERSION: HJR 23
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER, KELLY
- PASSED Y36 E3 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 23
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.STA)
- NR: JOHANSEN
- DP: JOHNSON, ROSES, DOLL, LYNN
- STA RPT 4DP 1NR
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS