+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: STOLTZE, COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE
- STA RPT 4DP
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- PASSED Y39 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 22
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, JOHNSON, JOSEPHSON, TARR, LYNN, LEDOUX, PRUITT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HJR 22
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: TALERICO, STUTES, KELLER, LYNN
- STA RPT 4DP
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor