+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 11, 1998 in the House:
- MOTION TO CONSIDER CONCUR FLD Y10 N22 A8
On May 8, 1998 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 7, 1998 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HJR 22(RLS)
- LEMAN, WARD
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, TAYLOR,
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RLS SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- ZERO FN (S.RLS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR W/SCS SAME TITLE 5/7
On April 30, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
On April 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- RES REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- KEMPLEN
- COSPONSORS: BARNES, HODGINS, DAVIES,
- PASSED Y38 N1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 22
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/97
On February 27, 1997 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.WTR)
- COWDERY; NR: NICHOLIA
- DP: KOTT, BARNES, AUSTERMAN, PHILLIPS,
- WTR RPT 5DP 1NR
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- WTR
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor