+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 6, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOTT
On May 5, 1997 in the House:
- STA RPT 1DP 2DNP 1NR 2AM
- DP: VEZEY; DNP: ELTON, BERKOWITZ
- NR: HODGINS; AM: JAMES, DYSON
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.RES) 4/1/97
- REFERRED TO RULES
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
On April 24, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On April 23, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG
On April 22, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
On April 18, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COWDERY, RYAN, MARTIN,
- VEZEY
On April 1, 1997 in the House:
- RES RPT 2DP 2DNP 3NR
- DP: MASEK, OGAN; DNP: NICHOLIA, JOULE
- NR: DYSON, GREEN, HUDSON
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.RES)
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES, STATE AFFAIRS
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor