+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, DYSON, MENARD, HUGGINS
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 21
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y38 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, FAIRCLOUGH, GARDNER, AUSTERMAN, PRUITT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HJR 21
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DICK
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: MUNOZ, GARDNER, DICK, HERRON, P.WILSON, SEATON, FEIGE
- RES RPT 7DP
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor