+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/14/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, HUGHES, FEIGE, TARR
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- MLV RPT 5DP
- DP: HIGGINS, GRUENBERG, HUGHES, FOSTER, LEDOUX
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- MLV
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor