+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (36)
On April 13, 1999 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/12 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- 2:10 PM 4/7/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4DP AND 1 OR 3/30/99
- DP: TIM KELLY, PEARCE, MILLER, LEMAN;
- OTHER RECOMMENDATION: ELLIS
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.MLV)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 21
- CROSS-SPONSOR(S): TIM KELLY, MACKIE,
- LEMAN, WILKEN, DONLEY, TAYLOR,
- PETE KELLY, PHILLIPS
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On March 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- RLS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 22, 1999 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN, KEMPLEN, DYSON,
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 21
- PASSED Y34 E6
- OGAN, HUDSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 16, 1999 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.MLV) 3/10/99
- WHITAKER, OGAN
- DP: JAMES, SMALLEY, KERTTULA, COGHILL,
- STA RPT 6DP
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- PHILLIPS, FOSTER
- COSPONSOR(S): MURKOWSKI, KOTT, JAMES,
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.MLV)
- PHILLIPS
- DP: MURKOWSKI, KOTT, JAMES, FOSTER,
- MLV RPT 5DP
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- MLV, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor