+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, WAGONER, FRENCH, HUGGINS
- DP: STEVENS
- RES RPT 1DP 4NR
- FN1: ZERO(H.FSH)
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 21
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/2009
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y30 E10
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HJR 21
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.FSH)
- NR: EDGMON, GUTTENBERG, KAWASAKI
- DP: OLSON, TUCK, SEATON, P.WILSON, NEUMAN, JOHNSON
- RES RPT 6DP 3NR
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, JOHNSON
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.FSH)
- NR: KAWASAKI, BUCH, EDGMON
- DP: JOHNSON, MILLETT, KELLER, MUNOZ
- FSH RPT 4DP 3NR
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- FSH, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor