+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On July 28, 1999 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/26 LEGIS RESOLVE 16
On May 13, 1999 in the House:
- 9:30 AM 5/13/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 20
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: WARD, GREEN, WILKEN, ELTON
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.EDT)
On April 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEMAN
On April 20, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 20
- PASSED Y33 E7
- COSPONSOR(S): SMALLEY
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 15, 1999 in the House:
- FIN RPT 9DP
- DP: THERRIAULT, BUNDE, KOHRING,
- AUSTERMAN, GRUSSENDORF, MOSES, DAVIS,
- WILLIAMS, FOSTER
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.EDT) 3/31/99
On April 14, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On March 31, 1999 in the House:
- EDT RPT 5DP 1NR
- DP: CISSNA, HALCRO, PHILLIPS, ROKEBERG,
- DYSON; NR: KERTTULA
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.EDT)
On March 19, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- EDT, FIN
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor