+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 10/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 26
- 12:55 PM 9/21/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 19(AET)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2018
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y20 N-
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER, MEYER, MICCICHE, VON IMHOF, BISHOP
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHJR 19(AET)
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(S.ARC)
- DP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, KELLY
- ARC RPT 4DP
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- RETURNED TO SENATE
- PRIME SPONSOR: LINCOLN
- BILL RECEIVED IN HOUSE
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO HOUSE PER REQUEST
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- ARC
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): KITO
- PASSED Y33 N6 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 19(AET)
- VERSION: CSHJR 19(AET)
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/15 - ON 5/16 CALENDAR
On May 13, 2017 in the House:
- HELD TO 5/15 CALENDAR
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2017
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/13 CALENDAR
- AET CS ADOPTED UC
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: TALERICO, JOSEPHSON, TUCK, NEUMAN, KNOPP, WESTLAKE
- TECHNICAL TITLE CORRECTION
- AET RPT CS(AET) NT 6DP
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- AET
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor