+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On May 8, 1997 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/7 LEGIS RESOLVE 20
On April 30, 1997 in the House:
- 1:30 PM 4/29/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- DONLEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y15 N5
- PEARCE, WILKEN, TORGERSON, GREEN, MILLER
- WARD, TAYLOR, HALFORD, DONLEY, SHARP,
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 16
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/97
- CROSS SPONSORS: KELLY, PARNELL, PHILLIPS
On April 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FN (H.STA/GOV)
- DP: GREEN, MACKIE, WARD
- STA RPT 3DP
On April 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- CROSS SPONSOR: LEMAN
- STATE AFFAIRS
On April 9, 1997 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): OGAN
- PASSED Y31 N9
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 16
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/97
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.STA/GOV)
- DNP: ELTON, BERKOWITZ; NR: IVAN
- DP: JAMES, HODGINS, VEZEY
- STA RPT 3DP 2DNP 1NR
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor