+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 4DP
- DP: GIESSEL, MICCICHE, BISHOP, DYSON
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 16(RES) AM
- PASSED Y37 N2 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN, T.WILSON, LYNN, HAWKER, KELLER, ISAACSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 16(RES) AM
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 5DP 3NR
- DP: JOHNSON, P.WILSON, SEATON, SADDLER, FEIGE
- NR: TUCK, OLSON, TARR
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON, TUCK, HUGHES, THOMPSON
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor