+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- HELD TO 4/2 CALENDAR
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/30 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2012
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- FN2: (GOV)
- NR: JOULE, EDGMON
- DNP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, DOOGAN
- DP: T.WILSON, COSTELLO, FAIRCLOUGH, NEUMAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FIN RPT 6DP 3DNP 2NR
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- FN1: (GOV)
- DNP: GRUENBERG, HOLMES
- DP: LYNN, KELLER, PRUITT, THOMPSON, GATTO
- JUD RPT 5DP 2DNP
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- FN1: (GOV)
- NR: PRUITT, FEIGE
- DNP: P.WILSON, SEATON, KAWASAKI
- DP: DICK
- EDC RPT 1DP 3DNP 2NR
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- EDC, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor