+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/4 LEGIS RESOLVE 28
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/4 LEGIS RESOLVE 28
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- 6:18 PM 3/3/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, JOSEPHSON
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 E5
- CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE
- CONCUR MESSAGE
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 18
- DP: GIESSEL, FRENCH, MICCICHE, DYSON, MCGUIRE
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES RPT SCS 5DP NEW TITLE
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, FRENCH, STEVENS, OLSON, DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE,
- DYSON, COGHILL, GARDNER, BISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL, FAIRCLOUGH, MEYER, STEDMAN
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHJR 15(RES)
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 15(RES)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 15(RES)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/17/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN, OLSON, LEDOUX, SADDLER, HERRON, LYNN, GARA, PRUITT,
- PASSED Y39 V1
- GATTIS, T.WILSON, KELLER, HUGHES, FOSTER, TARR, MUNOZ, HIGGINS, THOMPSON,
- REINBOLD, SEATON, TUCK, GRUENBERG, STOLTZE, NEUMAN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 15(RES)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- DP: HAWKER, JOHNSON, SEATON, TARR, OLSON, P.WILSON
- RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 1AM
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE, HAWKER
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor