+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- DNP: CARPENTER, TILTON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, KNOPP, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSTON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 7DP 4DNP
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- DP: DRUMMOND, STUTES, CLAMAN
- JUD RPT 3DP 1DNP 3NR
- DNP: EASTMAN
- NR: LEDOUX, KOPP, SHAW
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- DNP: VANCE, SHAW
- DP: HOPKINS, THOMPSON, STORY, FIELDS, KREISS-TOMKINS
- STA RPT 5DP 2DNP
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- STA, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS