+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 9/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
- 11:52 A.M. 8/30/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HJR 14
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- GRAY-JACKSON, HUGHES, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, STEDMAN, BISHOP, GIESSEL
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, OLSON, SHOWER, KAWASAKI, BIRCH, STEVENS,
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 14
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2019
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- DP: BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON, HOFFMAN, COSTELLO, BIRCH
- CRA RPT 5DP
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- VERSION: HJR 14
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR, KOPP, SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON, HANNAN
- PASSED Y39 N1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 14
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2019
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, VANCE
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- NR: RASMUSSEN
- DP: DRUMMOND, CLAMAN, STORY, TALERICO, WOOL, STUTES
- TRA RPT 6DP 1NR
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor