+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 6
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- 4:18 P.M. 5/13/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 14
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, GRAY-JACKSON, WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, REVAK, KIEHL
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HJR 14
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 1DP 2NR
- NR: COSTELLO, REVAK
- DP: GRAY-JACKSON
- FN1: ZERO(H.CRA)
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 14
- PASSED Y37 N3
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, STORY, CARPENTER, NELSON, SNYDER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HJR 14
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCKAY
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- CRA RPT 7DP
- DP: MCCABE, PRAX, PATKOTAK, DRUMMOND, MCCARTY, SCHRAGE, HANNAN
- FN1: ZERO(H.CRA)
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, THOMPSON, VANCE
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEBON, MCCARTY, MCCABE, PRAX, CRONK
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor