+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 14(HSS) AM S
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: STEDMAN, KELLY, MEYER
- NR: MICCICHE
- FN1: ZERO(H.HSS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM 1 TO AM 1 ADOPTED Y33 N5 E2
- AM NO 1 AS AM FAILED Y16 N21 E2 A1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y13 N24 E2 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 14(HSS)
- PASSED Y23 N13 E2 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, PRUITT, LEDOUX, HUGHES, MILLETT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 14(HSS)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 3DP 1DNP 2NR
- DP: KELLER, REINBOLD, HIGGINS
- DNP: TARR
- NR: NAGEAK, PRUITT
- FN1: ZERO(H.HSS)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, KELLER
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor