+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (58)
On September 27, 1995 in the House:
- SIGNED BY GOVERNOR 7/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- 1:15 PM 2/21/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N1 E1
- RETURN TO 2ND FOR AM 2 FLD Y9 N10 E1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- PHILLIPS, HALFORD, MILLER, GREEN,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLY, SALO,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/14/95
- TAYLOR, TORGERSON, LEMAN, SHARP,
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 13(O&G)
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- FRANK, RIEGER, PEARCE
On February 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DNR)
- RES RPT 5DP
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y32 N1 E7
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RESCIND PREVIOUS ACTION-UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y31 N2 E7
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/01/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- O&G CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 OFFERED
- AM NO 1 WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y15 N22 E2 A1
- DAVIES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- AM 1 TO AM 3 Y9 N28 E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 13(O&G)
- PASSED Y34 N3 E2 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): HANLEY, BUNDE, BRICE,
- KELLY, PARNELL, OGAN, PHILLIPS, JAMES,
- B.DAVIS, PORTER, KOHRING
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y7 N30 E2 A1
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- DP: AUSTERMAN, KOTT, GREEN
- RES RPT CS (O&G) NEW TITLE 6DP 1AM
- DP: WILLIAMS, OGAN, BARNES
- AM: NICHOLIA
- ZERO FN (DNR) 1/25/95
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
- FIRST COSPONSOR: ROKEBERG
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): G.DAVIS
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR)
- NR: FINKELSTEIN
- DP: ROKEBERG
- DP: BRICE, WILLIAMS, G.DAVIS, B.DAVIS
- O&G RPT CS(O&G) NEW TITLE 5DP 1NR
On January 19, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KUBINA, MACLEAN
On January 18, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAVIES
On January 16, 1995 in the House:
- O&G, RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor