+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 13, 1999 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/12 LEGIS RESOLVE 5
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- 2:10 PM 4/7/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 31, 1999 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E1 A1
On March 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 12(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On March 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 7DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: TORGERSON, PARNELL, PHILLIPS, GREEN,
- ADAMS, LEMAN, WILKEN; NR: DONLEY
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.FIN/LAW)
On March 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- HES RPT 4DP
- DP: MILLER, WILKEN, PETE KELLY, ELTON
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.FIN/LAW)
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, FIN
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 12(FIN)
- PASSED Y33 E5 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): BUNDE, PORTER, MURKOWSKI
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 1NR
- DP: THERRIAULT, MULDER, KOHRING,
- AUSTERMAN, DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF, DAVIS,
- WILLIAMS; NR: BUNDE
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.FIN/LAW)
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FIN