+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 14, 1997 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/12 LEGIS RESOLVE 5
On February 27, 1997 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 E2 A1
- 3:30 PM 2/27/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HJR 12(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TAYLOR, KELLY, WARD,
- LEMAN, SHARP, PEARCE, MACKIE, DONLEY,
- HALFORD, GREEN, TORGERSON, MILLER,
- PHILLIPS, PARNELL
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE
- DP: GREEN,TAYLOR,TORGERSON,LEMAN,SHARP
- H ZERO FN APPLIES TO SCS (LAA)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On February 7, 1997 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/7/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N28 E3
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y14 N22 E3 A1
- AM NO 3 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 3 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- NEW AM TO AM 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 AS AMENDED ADOPTED Y32 N5 E3
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y9 N28 E3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 12 AM
- PASSED Y37 E3
- COSPONSOR(S): KOTT, ROKEBERG, JAMES
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- RES RPT 7DP 1NR
- DP: DYSON, WILLIAMS, GREEN, BARNES,
- OGAN, HUDSON, JOULE; NR: NICHOLIA
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAA) 1/24/97
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): OGAN
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- O&G RPT 7DP
- DP: BUNDE, OGAN, BRICE, RYAN, KEMPLEN,
- HODGINS, ROKEBERG
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAA)
- COSPONSOR(S): RYAN, BUNDE
On January 15, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- OIL & GAS, RESOURCES
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor