+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/12 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- 9:37 A.M. 5/12/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y32 N2 E4 A2
- CONCUR TAKEN UP
- CONCUR READ AND HELD
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHJR 12(RES) AM S
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- RES SCS ADOPTED UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): REVAK, COSTELLO, HUGHES, REINBOLD, BISHOP, HOLLAND, STEDMAN,
- MICCICHE
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 12(RES) AM S
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- PASSED Y13 N2 E5
- ENGROSSED
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: REVAK, MICCICHE, STEVENS
- NR: KIEHL
- FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2021
- RES CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 12(RES)
- PASSED Y35 N3 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 12(RES)
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
- NR: FIELDS, HOPKINS
- DNP: HANNAN
- DP: MCKAY, CRONK, RAUSCHER, GILLHAM, SCHRAGE, PATKOTAK
- RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 1DNP 2NR
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- STA REFERRAL REMOVED
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- RES, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor