+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 26, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN2: (GOV)
- FN1: (REV)
- AM: GARA
- NR: GRUENBERG, COGHILL;
- DP: KOTT, ANDERSON, DAHLSTROM, MCGUIRE;
- JUD RPT CS(W&M) NT 4DP 2NR 1AM
On April 22, 2005 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(W&M) NT 4DP 2NR
- NR: GARDNER, GRUENBERG
- DP: LYNN, ELKINS, RAMRAS, SEATON;
- FN1: (REV)
On April 13, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: (REV)
- NR: SAMUELS
- DP: WILSON, SEATON, WEYHRAUCH;
- W&M RPT CS(W&M) NT 3DP 1NR
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- W&M, STA, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS