+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 24, 2011 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 5
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- 9:46 AM 3/18/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGGINS, MCGUIRE, DAVIS, EGAN, MEYER, MENARD, COGHILL,
- WAGONER, GIESSEL, DYSON, OLSON,
- HOFFMAN, THOMAS, PASKVAN, STEDMAN
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 11
- PASSED Y20 N -
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HJR 11
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: PASKVAN, WAGONER, MCGUIRE, STEVENS
- NR: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 11
- PASSED Y36 N1 E3
- COSPONSOR(S): JOULE, GARDNER, COSTELLO, FAIRCLOUGH
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HJR 11
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/11/2011
- HELD TO 2/14 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- RES RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: MUNOZ, GARDNER, KAWASAKI, P.WILSON, DICK, FEIGE
- NR: HERRON
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor