+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 7, 1999 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/6 LEGIS RESOLVE 8
On April 20, 1999 in the House:
- 9:15 AM 4/20/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 1999 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 N1 E2 A3
On April 12, 1999 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HJR 11(RES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 4/9/99
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEMAN
On April 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- PETE KELLY; NR: LINCOLN
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (O&G)
- DP: HALFORD, PARNELL, GREEN,
On March 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- ADAMS, WARD, HALFORD
- WILKEN, GREEN, TAYLOR, TIM KELLY,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MACKIE, DONLEY,
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 17, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 11
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N24 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JOULE
- PASSED Y37 N2 E1
- AUSTERMAN, HUDSON, OGAN, MULDER, FOSTER,
- DYSON, GREEN, COGHILL, BARNES, HALCRO,
- WILLIAMS, BUNDE, MORGAN, MURKOWSKI,
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG, PORTER,
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- DP: OGAN, SANDERS, JOULE, MASEK,
- RES RPT 6DP 1NR
- BARNES, HARRIS; NR: KAPSNER
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.O&G) 2/17/99
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.O&G)
- SMALLEY; NR: KEMPLEN
- DP: WHITAKER, OGAN, PHILLIPS, BRICE,
- O&G RPT CS(O&G) 5DP 1NR
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SMALLEY
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WHITAKER
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- O&G, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor