+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On August 5, 2009 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 25
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 4:20 PM 5/21/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHJR 10(HSS)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- V1
- HOFFMAN, THERRIAULT, WAGONER, FRENCH, DYSON, DAVIS, THOMAS, KOOKESH, STEVENS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE, HUGGINS, MEYER, MENARD, PASKVAN, ELLIS,
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 10(HSS)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: MENARD, FRENCH, PASKVAN
- NR: KOOKESH
On April 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: DAVIS, DYSON, PASKVAN
- HSS RPT 3DP
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- HSS, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2009
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: CSHJR 10(HSS)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 10(HSS)
- PASSED Y36 E3 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, DAHLSTROM, DOOGAN, HERRON, GARA, AUSTERMAN,
- JOHNSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: HOLMES, COGHILL, SEATON, LYNN, CISSNA, HERRON, KELLER
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) 7DP
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: KAWASAKI, OLSON, HARRIS, LYNN, BUCH, GATTO
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) 6DP
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- MLV, STA, HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor