+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY
On May 2, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS
On May 1, 2021 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- AM: VANCE
- NR: KURKA
- DNP: EASTMAN
- DP: DRUMMOND, SNYDER, KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- W&M RPT CS(W&M) 5DP 2DNP
- DNP: EASTMAN, PRAX
- DP: WOOL, JOSEPHSON, SCHRAGE, STORY, SPOHNHOLZ
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- W&M REPLACES STA REFERRAL
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- STA, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
- READ THE FIRST TIME
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21