+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 10, 1995 in the House:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 4/07 LEGIS RESOLVE 11
On March 24, 1995 in the House:
- 3:05 PM 3/23/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- GREEN, TORGERSON, HALFORD, HOFFMAN,FRANK
- ELLIS, TAYLOR, KELLY, RIEGER, MILLER,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SALO, PEARCE, DUNCAN,
- READ THE SECOND TIME HCR 8
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/95
On March 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR: LINCOLN
On March 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (LAA)
- STA RPT 3DP 2NR
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 15, 1995 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y36 N2 E2
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/15/95
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NICHOLIA
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAVIES
- COSPONSOR(S): NAVARRE, GRUSSENDORF
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ELTON, PARNELL
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- RULES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor