+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- NR: MICCICHE, MEYER
- DP: COSTELLO, GARDNER
- L&C RPT 2DP 2NR
- FN2: ZERO(LEG)
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- EDC REFERRAL WAIVED UC
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- EDC, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y40
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HCR 8 AM
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- NR: NEUMAN
- DP: TARR, FANSLER, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES
- FSH RPT 4DP 1NR
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- FSH
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE FISHERIES
Type:
Primary Sponsor