+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On July 28, 1999 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/22 LEGIS RESOLVE 10
On April 27, 1999 in the House:
- 2:40 PM 4/26/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME
- TAKE UP SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS U/C
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y20 N- HCR 7
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On April 23, 1999 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN SECOND READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y27 N12 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 22, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FAILED Y24 N9 E1 A6 HCR 7
- MULDER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 13, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RULES FOR CALENDARING
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor