+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 24, 2011 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 7
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- 9:10 AM 4/6/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- BEFORE THE SENATE IN FINAL PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGGINS, WAGONER, FRENCH
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HCR 6
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 5DP
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, GIESSEL, MEYER, PASKVAN, KOOKESH
- FN1: ZERO(H.RLS)
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, MEYER, STEDMAN, DAVIS, EGAN, ELLIS, PASKVAN, MENARD,
- THOMAS, COGHILL, OLSON, DYSON, GIESSEL
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN1: ZERO(H.RLS)
- PASSED Y34 E5 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN, JOHANSEN, JOHNSON, STOLTZE, TUCK, HERRON, OLSON, LYNN,
- SEATON, PRUITT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HCR 6
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, MILLETT, HOLMES, P.WILSON, CISSNA, GARDNER, T.WILSON
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RLS FOR CALENDARING
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor