+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 10, 2015 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 12
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- 4:56 PM 4/17/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): VAZQUEZ
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 E3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, COSTELLO, KELLY, DUNLEAVY, OLSON, ELLIS, STEDMAN
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ARC SCS ADOPTED UC
- EGAN, GIESSEL, MACKINNON, HOFFMAN, COGHILL, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BISHOP, MEYER
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHCR 5(ARC)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: GIESSEL, MCGUIRE, OLSON, HOFFMAN, STEVENS, COGHILL
- ARC RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- ARC
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y28 N10 E2
- PASSED Y38 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
- VERSION: CSHCR 5(EDA) AM
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, TUCK, JOSEPHSON
- HELD TO 3/23 CALENDAR
- EDA CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2015
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- NR: TILTON
- DP: ORTIZ, WOOL, HERRON
- EDA RPT CS(EDA) NT 3DP 1NR
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- EDA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor