+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 5
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- 11:25 AM 4/25/07 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HCR 5
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- DAVIS, FRENCH, WAGONER, BUNDE, ELLIS, STEDMAN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELTON, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE, WILKEN, OLSON, THOMAS, DYSON,
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/2007
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 13, 2007 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2007
- VERSION: HCR 5
- PASSED Y35 E5
- COSPONSOR(S): DOOGAN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS
- FN1: ZERO(H.JUD)
- DP: GRUENBERG, LYNN, COGHILL, SAMUELS, HOLMES, RAMRAS
- JUD RPT 6DP
On March 30, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor