+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- 1:53 PM 5/2/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/9 LEGIS RESOLVE 8
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HCR 4
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP
- DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, GIESSEL
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y37 E3
- COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS, TARR, COSTELLO, JOHNSON, TUCK, MILLETT, PRUITT,
- MUNOZ
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HCR 4
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- MLV RPT 6DP 1AM
- DP: SADDLER, HUGHES, GRUENBERG, HIGGINS, FOSTER, LEDOUX
- AM: REINBOLD
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, HIGGINS, KELLER, FEIGE, HOLMES, NAGEAK, HUGHES, FOSTER
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- MLV
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor