+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On October 28, 2004 in the House:
- HOUSE APPOINTEE: COGHILL
On October 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- SENATE APPOINTEE: STEDMAN
- MINORITY APPOINTEE: GUESS
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- 3:45 PM 6/25/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/28 LEGIS RESOLVE 52
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHCR 32(FIN)
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1
On May 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- NR: WILKEN, OLSON;
- DP: DYSON, HOFFMAN, BUNDE, STEVENS B
- FN1: ZERO(UA)
- FN4: (LEG)
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 2DP 3NR
- NR: BUNDE, FRENCH, STEVENS G;
- DP: SEEKINS, DAVIS
- FN1: ZERO(UA)
- FN3: (LEG)
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
On April 23, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/23/04
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EDT CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y33 E3 A4
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHCR 32(EDT) AM
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(EDT) 5DP 4NR
- DP: MOSES, CHENAULT, FATE, FOSTER,
- WILLIAMS; NR: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE,
- HARRIS
- FN1: ZERO(UA)
- FN3: (LEG)
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- EDT RPT CS(EDT) 5DP
- DP: KOTT, KOHRING, CRAWFORD, CISSNA,
- HEINZE
- FN1: ZERO(UA)
- FN2: (LEG)
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HEINZE
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDT, FIN