+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (55)
On November 15, 2006 in the House:
- HOUSE MEMBERS: SAMUELS, JOULE
- PUBLIC MEMBERS: BOB PAWLOWSKI, LANCE MILLER, STEPHANIE MADSEN,
- DENNIS NOTTINGHAM, CALEB PUNGOWIYI, MICHAEL HURLEY, JOHN SHIVELY
On November 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- SENATE MEMBERS: G. STEVENS, OLSON
On July 10, 2006 in the House:
- 4:27 PM 7/5/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/7 LEGIS RESOLVE 49
On May 9, 2006 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 A4
On May 7, 2006 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- FIN SCS RECEIVED SAME TITLE
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- FINAL PASSAGE - SCS CSHCR 30(FIN)
- PASSED Y17 N- A3
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHCR 30(FIN)
On May 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS FORTHCOMING 4NR 2DP
- NR: WILKEN, GREEN, DYSON, STEDMAN
- DP: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
- FN3: (LEG)
On April 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, ELTON, ELLIS
On April 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- RES REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On April 13, 2006 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y29 E11
- KELLY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y28 E11 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER, KAPSNER, SEATON, CROFT, GRUENBERG
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHCR 30(FIN) AM
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MOSES
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG
On April 10, 2006 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 4NR
- DP: WEYHRAUCH, MOSES, KERTTULA, MEYER;
- NR: HAWKER, HOLM, KELLY, STOLTZE
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
- FN2: (LEG)
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On March 29, 2006 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 3NR
- DP: KAPSNER, SEATON, ELKINS, CRAWFORD, SAMUELS, RAMRAS;
- NR: GATTO, OLSON, LEDOUX
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
- FN2: (LEG)
On March 28, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS
On March 27, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SAMUELS
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor